05/03/2011 | No New File by Committee on Planning and Development | |||
05/03/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
05/02/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
05/02/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/02/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/27/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Planning and Development | |||
04/18/2011 | File Number 557 | |||
04/18/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 339 | |||
04/11/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/18/11 10:00 AM | |||
03/25/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |||
03/25/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |||
03/18/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |||
02/18/2011 | Public Hearing 02/23 | |||
02/17/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment | |||
02/16/2011 | Drafted by Committee | |||
01/28/2011 | Vote to Draft |