06/08/2011 | Senate Recommitted to Human Services | |||
05/11/2011 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | |||
03/28/2011 | File Number 214 | |||
03/28/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 163 | |||
03/28/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
03/28/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/21/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/11 10:00 AM | |||
03/11/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/10/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
02/25/2011 | Public Hearing 03/01 | |||
02/16/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services | |||
02/14/2011 | Drafted by Committee | |||
01/25/2011 | Vote to Draft |