05/25/2011 | No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |||
05/25/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
05/25/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
05/25/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/25/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/19/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |||
05/17/2011 | File Number 805 | |||
05/17/2011 | New File by Committee on Appropriations | |||
05/11/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/16/11 5:00 PM | |||
05/04/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
04/27/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |||
04/07/2011 | File Number 442 | |||
04/07/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 278 | |||
04/01/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/04/2011 | Public Hearing 03/08 | |||
03/03/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services | |||
03/02/2011 | Drafted by Committee | |||
01/25/2011 | Vote to Draft |