|
06/01/2011
|
House Calendar Number 572
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 7554
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6739
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
No New File by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
04/21/2011
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
|
03/23/2011
|
File Number 155
|
|
|
|
03/23/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 143
|
|
|
|
03/17/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/11 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
02/25/2011
|
Public Hearing 03/01
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services
|
|
|
|
02/14/2011
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
|
01/25/2011
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|