07/13/2011 | Signed by the Governor | |||
06/30/2011 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |||
06/28/2011 | Public Act 11-163 | |||
06/08/2011 | In Concurrence | |||
06/08/2011 | House Passed | |||
05/23/2011 | House Calendar Number 534 | |||
05/23/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
05/19/2011 | On Consent Calendar | |||
05/19/2011 | Senate Passed | |||
04/27/2011 | No New File by Committee on Judiciary | |||
04/27/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/27/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/27/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/26/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/21/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary | |||
03/07/2011 | File Number 26 | |||
03/07/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 47 | |||
02/28/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/07/11 10:00 AM | |||
02/04/2011 | Public Hearing 02/10 | |||
02/01/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate | |||
01/31/2011 | Drafted by Committee | |||
01/26/2011 | Vote to Draft |