03/17/2011 | File Number 71 | |||
03/17/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 95 | |||
03/17/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
03/17/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/11/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/16/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/03/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/03/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
02/18/2011 | Public Hearing 02/24 | |||
02/16/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees | |||
02/15/2011 | Drafted by Committee | |||
02/08/2011 | Vote to Draft |