07/01/2011 | Signed by the Governor | |||
06/16/2011 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |||
06/14/2011 | Public Act 11-56 | |||
06/04/2011 | In Concurrence | |||
06/04/2011 | House Passed | |||
04/28/2011 | House Calendar Number 392 | |||
04/28/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/27/2011 | On Consent Calendar | |||
04/27/2011 | Senate Passed | |||
04/06/2011 | File Number 417 | |||
04/06/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 252 | |||
04/06/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/06/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/31/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/05/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/21/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/18/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
03/14/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Transportation | |||
03/11/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Transportation | |||
03/08/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Transportation | |||
02/25/2011 | Public Hearing 03/01 | |||
02/07/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs | |||
02/04/2011 | Drafted by Committee | |||
01/28/2011 | Vote to Draft |