|
07/08/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
06/24/2011
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
06/17/2011
|
Public Act 11-68
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
|
06/03/2011
|
House Calendar Number 588
|
|
|
|
06/03/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A, B
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 7958
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6733
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
No New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
File Number 366
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 236
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/11 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
03/14/2011
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Transportation
|
|
|
|
03/11/2011
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Transportation
|
|
|
|
03/08/2011
|
Joint Favorable Change of Reference Transportation
|
|
|
|
03/04/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
|
02/15/2011
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
|
02/03/2011
|
Public Hearing 02/10
|
|
|
|
01/28/2011
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|