|
07/01/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
Public Act 11-62
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
House Passed
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
House Calendar Number 526
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
No New File by Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
File Number 628
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 384
|
|
|
|
04/18/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/26/11 10:00 AM
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
03/14/2011
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
03/11/2011
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
03/08/2011
|
Joint Favorable Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
03/04/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
|
02/15/2011
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
|
02/03/2011
|
Public Hearing 02/10
|
|
|
|
01/28/2011
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|