|
07/13/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
06/30/2011
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
Public Act 11-225
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/03/2011
|
House Calendar Number 589
|
|
|
|
06/03/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A, B
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 6065
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6677
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
No New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
File Number 49
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 64
|
|
|
|
03/04/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/09/11 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
02/22/2011
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
02/04/2011
|
Public Hearing 02/10
|
|
|
|
02/01/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
|
|
|
|
01/31/2011
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
|
01/26/2011
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|