|
07/13/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
06/30/2011
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
Special Act 11-14
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
No New File by Committee on Public Safety and Security
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
05/17/2011
|
Referred by House to Committee on Public Safety and Security
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
House Calendar Number 489
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5628
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
File Number 500
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
New File by Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/11 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
04/01/2011
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
File Number 118
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 112
|
|
|
|
03/14/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/11 10:00 AM
|
|
|
|
02/23/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on General Law
|
|
|
|
02/22/2011
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
|
02/15/2011
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
|
02/02/2011
|
Public Hearing 02/08
|
|
|