07/13/2011 | Signed by the Governor | |||
06/30/2011 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |||
06/28/2011 | Public Act 11-164 | |||
06/08/2011 | In Concurrence | |||
06/08/2011 | House Passed | |||
04/28/2011 | House Calendar Number 394 | |||
04/28/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/27/2011 | On Consent Calendar | |||
04/27/2011 | Senate Passed | |||
03/28/2011 | File Number 215 | |||
03/28/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 161 | |||
03/28/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
03/28/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/21/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/11 10:00 AM | |||
03/15/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/15/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
02/23/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law | |||
02/22/2011 | Drafted by Committee | |||
02/15/2011 | Vote to Draft | |||
02/02/2011 | Public Hearing 02/08 |