05/28/2011 | House Calendar Number 557 | |||
05/28/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
05/26/2011 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |||
05/26/2011 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5850 | |||
04/04/2011 | File Number 329 | |||
04/04/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 225 | |||
04/04/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/04/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/28/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/11 10:00 AM | |||
03/17/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
03/17/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
02/17/2011 | Public Hearing 02/22 | |||
02/08/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate | |||
02/07/2011 | Drafted by Committee | |||
01/26/2011 | Vote to Draft |