07/01/2011 | Signed by the Governor | |||
06/16/2011 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |||
06/14/2011 | Public Act 11-63 | |||
06/07/2011 | In Concurrence | |||
06/07/2011 | House Passed | |||
05/13/2011 | House Calendar Number 509 | |||
05/13/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
05/12/2011 | On Consent Calendar | |||
05/12/2011 | Senate Passed | |||
04/08/2011 | No New File by Committee on General Law | |||
04/08/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/08/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/07/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/07/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/01/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on General Law | |||
03/07/2011 | File Number 27 | |||
03/07/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 49 | |||
02/28/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/07/11 10:00 AM | |||
02/24/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
02/02/2011 | Public Hearing 02/10 | |||
01/21/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |