04/28/2011 | No New File by Committee on Transportation | |||
04/28/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/28/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/28/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/27/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/21/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Transportation | |||
03/17/2011 | File Number 74 | |||
03/17/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 96 | |||
03/11/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/16/11 5:00 PM | |||
02/10/2011 | Public Hearing 02/15 | |||
02/09/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees | |||
02/08/2011 | Drafted by Committee | |||
02/08/2011 | Vote to Draft |