05/12/2011 | No New File by Committee on Judiciary | |||
05/12/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
05/12/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/12/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/12/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
05/11/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary | |||
05/04/2011 | No New File by Committee on Transportation | |||
04/27/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Transportation | |||
04/07/2011 | File Number 443 | |||
04/07/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 282 | |||
04/01/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/10/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development | |||
03/09/2011 | Drafted by Committee | |||
03/07/2011 | Vote to Draft | |||
02/25/2011 | Public Hearing 03/02 | |||
01/31/2011 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |