03/14/2011 | Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |||
03/14/2011 | Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |||
03/11/2011 | Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |||
03/10/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development | |||
03/09/2011 | Drafted by Committee | |||
03/07/2011 | Vote to Draft | |||
02/02/2011 | Public Hearing 02/07 | |||
01/28/2011 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |