05/11/2011 | No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |||
05/11/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
05/10/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/10/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/10/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
05/05/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |||
04/20/2011 | No New File by Committee on Environment | |||
04/14/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Environment | |||
04/07/2011 | File Number 445 | |||
04/07/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 284 | |||
04/01/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/22/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development | |||
03/21/2011 | Drafted by Committee | |||
03/07/2011 | Vote to Draft | |||
02/10/2011 | Public Hearing 02/14 | |||
01/28/2011 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |