03/03/2011 | Public Hearing 03/07 | |||
03/02/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation | |||
03/01/2011 | Drafted by Committee | |||
02/07/2011 | Vote to Draft | |||
01/31/2011 | Change of Reference, House to Committee on Transportation | |||
01/31/2011 | Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Transportation | |||
01/28/2011 | Change of Reference Transportation | |||
01/21/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |