|
07/08/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
06/24/2011
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
06/17/2011
|
Public Act 11-69
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
|
05/13/2011
|
House Calendar Number 510
|
|
|
|
05/13/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6022
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
File Number 501
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 301
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/11 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
03/28/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
03/25/2011
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
02/28/2011
|
Public Hearing 03/04
|
|
|
|
02/14/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
|
02/10/2011
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
|
01/28/2011
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|