04/29/2011 | No New File by Committee on Human Services | |||
04/29/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/29/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/29/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/28/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/27/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Human Services | |||
04/14/2011 | File Number 530 | |||
04/14/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 320 | |||
04/08/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/29/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health | |||
03/28/2011 | Drafted by Committee | |||
03/14/2011 | Vote to Draft | |||
02/17/2011 | Public Hearing 02/23 | |||
01/31/2011 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |