04/14/2011 | File Number 531 | |||
04/14/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 321 | |||
04/14/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/14/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/08/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/30/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/30/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
02/17/2011 | Public Hearing 02/23 | |||
02/16/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health | |||
02/15/2011 | Drafted by Committee | |||
02/09/2011 | Vote to Draft |