04/27/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary | |||
03/29/2011 | File Number 256 | |||
03/29/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 183 | |||
03/29/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
03/29/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/23/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/15/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/15/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
03/02/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security | |||
03/01/2011 | Drafted by Committee | |||
02/22/2011 | Vote to Draft | |||
02/04/2011 | Public Hearing 02/10 | |||
02/01/2011 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |