03/15/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Planning and Development | |||
03/14/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Planning and Development | |||
03/11/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/10/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/08/2011 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Planning and Development | |||
02/10/2011 | Public Hearing 02/15 | |||
02/09/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security | |||
02/08/2011 | Drafted by Committee | |||
02/03/2011 | Vote to Draft |