05/05/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |||
04/06/2011 | File Number 418 | |||
04/06/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 239 | |||
04/06/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/06/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/31/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/05/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/22/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
03/22/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/15/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Commerce | |||
03/14/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Commerce | |||
03/10/2011 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Commerce | |||
02/25/2011 | Public Hearing 03/03 | |||
02/24/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging | |||
02/23/2011 | Drafted by Committee | |||
02/01/2011 | Vote to Draft |