04/07/2011 | No New File by Committee on Transportation | |||
04/07/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/07/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/06/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/06/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/01/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Transportation | |||
03/24/2011 | File Number 204 | |||
03/24/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 158 | |||
03/18/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/11/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
02/28/2011 | Public Hearing 03/04 | |||
02/25/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development | |||
02/24/2011 | Drafted by Committee | |||
02/01/2011 | Vote to Draft |