04/27/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary | |||
04/20/2011 | No New File by Committee on Planning and Development | |||
04/20/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/19/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/19/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/18/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/14/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Planning and Development | |||
04/06/2011 | File Number 419 | |||
04/06/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 253 | |||
03/31/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/05/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/17/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation | |||
03/16/2011 | Drafted by Committee | |||
03/02/2011 | Vote to Draft | |||
02/10/2011 | Public Hearing 02/14 | |||
02/04/2011 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |