|
07/13/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
06/30/2011
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
Special Act 11-15
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/03/2011
|
House Calendar Number 590
|
|
|
|
06/03/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8129
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
|
04/21/2011
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
File Number 503
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 303
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/11 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
03/23/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
|
03/22/2011
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
|
03/07/2011
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
|
02/25/2011
|
Public Hearing 03/02
|
|
|
|
01/31/2011
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|