Connecticut 2011 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00766 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-General Assembly Committee Bill No. 766
2-January Session, 2011 LCO No. 4049
3- *04049SB00766TRA*
1+General Assembly Proposed Bill No. 766
2+January Session, 2011 LCO No. 1500
43 Referred to Committee on Transportation
54 Introduced by:
6-(TRA)
5+SEN. WELCH, 31st Dist.
76
87 General Assembly
98
10-Committee Bill No. 766
9+Proposed Bill No. 766
1110
1211 January Session, 2011
1312
14-LCO No. 4049
15-
16-*04049SB00766TRA*
13+LCO No. 1500
1714
1815 Referred to Committee on Transportation
1916
2017 Introduced by:
2118
22-(TRA)
19+SEN. WELCH, 31st Dist.
2320
24-AN ACT AUTHORIZING THE REPLACEMENT OF CERTAIN ADVERTISING STRUCTURES, SIGNS, DISPLAYS OR DEVICES.
21+AN ACT ALLOWING THE REPLACEMENT OF CERTAIN EXISTING BILLBOARDS.
2522
2623 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:
2724
28-Section 1. Subsection (j) of section 13a-123 of the general statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective October 1, 2011):
29-
30-(j) The commissioner may order the removal of any advertising structure, sign, display or device along any interstate, federal-aid primary, or other limited access state highway erected in violation of this section. Any advertising structure, sign, display or device in existence on September 1, 1965, within six hundred and sixty feet of the right-of-way of any interstate, federal-aid primary, or other limited access state highway may continue to be maintained until July 1, 1970, but may not be replaced or relocated on such highway except (1) in areas where otherwise allowed by statute or regulations adopted thereunder, or (2) if such sign is removed from a building to which it is attached for purposes of repair or reconstruction of the building, the identical sign may be returned to its original position. Any advertising structure, sign, display or device lawfully erected since September 1, 1965, within six hundred sixty feet of the right-of-way of any interstate, federal-aid primary, or other limited access state highway and before June 21, 1967, may continue to be maintained until the end of the fifth year after it becomes nonconforming, but may not be replaced or relocated on such highway except in areas where otherwise allowed by statute or regulations adopted thereunder. Any advertising structure, sign, display or device lawfully erected on or after October 1, 2006, and in existence on October 1, 2011, within six hundred sixty feet of the right-of-way of any interstate, federal-aid primary, or other limited access state highway may be replaced, provided (A) such structure, sign, display or device cannot be repaired, (B) no dimension of such replacement structure, sign, display or device shall exceed the same dimension of the structure, sign, display or device being replaced, and (C) such replacement structure, sign, display or device shall be located in the original position and location of the existing structure, sign, display or device. If the person, firm or corporation in control of or owning a structure, sign, display or device or whose name appears thereon does not remove it within fourteen days after an order of removal has been sent to such person, firm or corporation by registered or certified mail, said commissioner may cause such structure, sign, display or device to be removed and the expense of such removal may be collected from the person, firm or corporation owning or controlling the same in an action based on the provisions of this section, or from the sureties on the bond filed by a nonresident person, firm or corporation pursuant to section 21-54.
31-
32-
33-
34-
35-This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
36-Section 1 October 1, 2011 13a-123(j)
37-
38-This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
39-
40-Section 1
41-
42-October 1, 2011
43-
44-13a-123(j)
25+That section 13a-123 of the general statutes be amended to allow the replacement of any billboard already erected, provided the current billboard structure is not repairable and the replacement structure will be on the same footprint and have the same height and width as the current billboard.
4526
4627 Statement of Purpose:
4728
48-To allow the replacement of certain advertising structures, signs, displays or devices.
49-
50-[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not underlined.]
51-
52-
53-
54-Co-Sponsors: SEN. WELCH, 31st Dist.
55-
56-Co-Sponsors:
57-
58-SEN. WELCH, 31st Dist.
59-
60-S.B. 766
29+To allow the replacement of existing billboards in certain circumstances.