03/16/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations | |||
03/15/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |||
03/15/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/11/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/10/2011 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Appropriations | |||
02/17/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Human Services | |||
02/17/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Human Services | |||
02/15/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Human Services | |||
02/03/2011 | Public Hearing 02/10 | |||
01/27/2011 | Public Hearing 02/01 | |||
01/25/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |