|
07/13/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
06/30/2011
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
Public Act 11-228
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
House Calendar Number 491
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6118
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
No New File by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
04/21/2011
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
|
04/06/2011
|
File Number 420
|
|
|
|
04/06/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 251
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/05/11 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
03/16/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
|
|
|
|
03/15/2011
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
|
02/25/2011
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Public Hearing 02/23
|
|
|
|
02/09/2011
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|