03/23/2011 | File Number 157 | |||
03/23/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 136 | |||
03/23/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
03/23/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/17/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/10/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/09/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
02/01/2011 | Public Hearing 02/09 | |||
01/26/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |