06/03/2011 | Signed by the Governor | |||
05/31/2011 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |||
05/25/2011 | Public Act 11-24 | |||
05/19/2011 | In Concurrence | |||
05/19/2011 | House Passed | |||
04/29/2011 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/29/2011 | No New File by Committee on Judiciary | |||
04/29/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/29/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/28/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/26/2011 | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary | |||
04/15/2011 | House Calendar Number 326 | |||
04/15/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/13/2011 | On Consent Calendar | |||
04/13/2011 | Senate Passed | |||
03/24/2011 | File Number 205 | |||
03/24/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 151 | |||
03/24/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
03/18/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/11 5:00 PM | |||
02/01/2011 | Public Hearing 02/09 | |||
01/26/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |