05/02/2011 | File Number 691 | |||
05/02/2011 | New File by Committee on Planning and Development | |||
05/02/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
05/02/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/25/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/02/11 10:00 AM | |||
04/19/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/18/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
04/14/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Planning and Development | |||
04/06/2011 | File Number 421 | |||
04/06/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 249 | |||
03/31/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/05/11 5:00 PM | |||
02/01/2011 | Public Hearing 02/09 | |||
01/26/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |