04/01/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Energy and Technology | |||
03/22/2011 | File Number 127 | |||
03/22/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 120 | |||
03/22/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
03/22/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/16/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/10/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/09/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
01/27/2011 | Public Hearing 01/31 | |||
01/26/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |