04/27/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |||
02/22/2011 | File Number 12 | |||
02/22/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 40 | |||
02/22/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
02/22/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
02/14/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 02/22/11 10:00 AM | |||
02/09/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
02/08/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
01/28/2011 | Public Hearing 02/03 | |||
01/27/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |