05/24/2011 | Signed by the Governor | |||
05/20/2011 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |||
05/18/2011 | Public Act 11-19 | |||
05/12/2011 | In Concurrence | |||
05/12/2011 | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |||
05/12/2011 | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A | |||
04/28/2011 | House Calendar Number 395 | |||
04/28/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/27/2011 | On Consent Calendar | |||
04/27/2011 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |||
04/27/2011 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4344 | |||
03/01/2011 | File Number 13 | |||
03/01/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 46 | |||
03/01/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
03/01/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
02/23/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 02/28/11 5:00 PM | |||
02/15/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
02/10/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
01/28/2011 | Public Hearing 02/03 | |||
01/27/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |