04/28/2011 | House Calendar Number 397 | |||
04/28/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/27/2011 | On Consent Calendar | |||
04/27/2011 | Senate Passed | |||
03/07/2011 | File Number 24 | |||
03/07/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 52 | |||
03/07/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
03/07/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
02/28/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/07/11 10:00 AM | |||
02/16/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
02/16/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
02/04/2011 | Public Hearing 02/09 | |||
01/31/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |