05/09/2011 | Signed by the Governor | |||
05/03/2011 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |||
05/02/2011 | Public Act 11-5 | |||
04/27/2011 | In Concurrence | |||
04/27/2011 | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |||
04/27/2011 | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A | |||
04/15/2011 | House Calendar Number 327 | |||
04/15/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/13/2011 | On Consent Calendar | |||
04/13/2011 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |||
04/13/2011 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5337 | |||
03/23/2011 | File Number 160 | |||
03/23/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 146 | |||
03/23/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
03/23/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/17/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/11/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/07/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
02/14/2011 | Public Hearing 02/18 | |||
01/31/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |