05/28/2011 | House Calendar Number 558 | |||
05/28/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
05/26/2011 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B | |||
05/26/2011 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 7507 | |||
05/26/2011 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6247 | |||
04/27/2011 | No New File by Committee on Judiciary | |||
04/27/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/27/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/27/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/26/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/21/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary | |||
03/23/2011 | File Number 161 | |||
03/23/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 147 | |||
03/17/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/11 5:00 PM | |||
02/14/2011 | Public Hearing 02/18 | |||
01/31/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |