|
07/08/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
06/24/2011
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
06/17/2011
|
Public Act 11-81
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
|
06/03/2011
|
House Calendar Number 594
|
|
|
|
06/03/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6429
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
No New File by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
|
04/21/2011
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
|
03/23/2011
|
File Number 162
|
|
|
|
03/23/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 140
|
|
|
|
03/17/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/11 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Public Hearing 02/24
|
|
|
|
02/01/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on General Law
|
|
|