04/14/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |||
03/24/2011 | File Number 206 | |||
03/24/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 152 | |||
03/24/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
03/24/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/18/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/15/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/15/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
02/02/2011 | Public Hearing 02/08 | |||
02/01/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |