05/28/2011 | House Calendar Number 559 | |||
05/28/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
05/26/2011 | Senate Passed | |||
05/04/2011 | No New File by Committee on Judiciary | |||
05/04/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
05/03/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/03/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/03/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/27/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary | |||
04/13/2011 | No New File by Committee on Planning and Development | |||
04/07/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Planning and Development | |||
03/21/2011 | File Number 119 | |||
03/21/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 113 | |||
03/14/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/11 10:00 AM | |||
02/17/2011 | Public Hearing 02/24 | |||
02/01/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |