05/12/2011 | House Calendar Number 493 | |||
05/12/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
05/11/2011 | On Consent Calendar | |||
05/11/2011 | Senate Passed | |||
04/06/2011 | No New File by Committee on Public Safety and Security | |||
04/06/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/06/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/06/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/05/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/01/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Public Safety and Security | |||
03/22/2011 | File Number 130 | |||
03/22/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 132 | |||
03/16/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/11 5:00 PM | |||
02/14/2011 | Public Hearing 02/18 | |||
02/01/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |