05/28/2011 | House Calendar Number 560 | |||
05/28/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
05/26/2011 | Senate Passed | |||
05/11/2011 | File Number 795 | |||
05/11/2011 | New File by Committee on Appropriations | |||
05/11/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
05/11/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/05/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/10/11 5:00 PM | |||
05/05/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/04/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
04/27/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |||
03/08/2011 | File Number 45 | |||
03/08/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 58 | |||
03/01/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/07/11 5:00 PM | |||
02/04/2011 | Public Hearing 02/10 | |||
02/01/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |