05/02/2011 | No New File by Committee on Education | |||
05/02/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
05/02/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/02/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/29/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/27/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Education | |||
04/20/2011 | File Number 603 | |||
04/20/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 367 | |||
04/14/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/19/11 5:00 PM | |||
04/01/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
02/02/2011 | Public Hearing 02/07 | |||
02/01/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |