|
07/08/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
06/24/2011
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
06/17/2011
|
Public Act 11-82
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
|
06/03/2011
|
House Calendar Number 595
|
|
|
|
06/03/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7891
|
|
|
|
04/08/2011
|
No New File by Committee on Human Services
|
|
|
|
04/08/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/08/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/08/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
04/01/2011
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Human Services
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
File Number 113
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 114
|
|
|
|
03/14/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/11 10:00 AM
|
|
|
|
03/07/2011
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
02/02/2011
|
Public Hearing 02/07
|
|
|
|
02/01/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|