07/01/2011 | Vetoed by the Governor | |||
06/16/2011 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |||
06/14/2011 | Public Act 11-65 | |||
06/07/2011 | In Concurrence | |||
06/07/2011 | House Passed | |||
06/07/2011 | On Consent Calendar | |||
05/12/2011 | House Calendar Number 494 | |||
05/12/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
05/11/2011 | Senate Passed | |||
04/06/2011 | No New File by Committee on Planning and Development | |||
04/06/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/05/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/05/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/04/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/01/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Planning and Development | |||
03/08/2011 | File Number 46 | |||
03/08/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 60 | |||
03/01/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/07/11 5:00 PM | |||
02/10/2011 | Public Hearing 02/15 | |||
02/03/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |