04/14/2011 | Motion Failed JF | |||
03/09/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Judiciary | |||
03/09/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Judiciary | |||
03/08/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/04/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/03/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Judiciary | |||
02/04/2011 | Public Hearing 02/08 | |||
02/03/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |