Connecticut 2011 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00897 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 General Assembly Raised Bill No. 897
22 January Session, 2011 LCO No. 2683
3- *_____SB00897PD____032811____*
3+ *02683_______PD_*
44 Referred to Committee on Planning and Development
55 Introduced by:
66 (PD)
77
88 General Assembly
99
1010 Raised Bill No. 897
1111
1212 January Session, 2011
1313
1414 LCO No. 2683
1515
16-*_____SB00897PD____032811____*
16+*02683_______PD_*
1717
1818 Referred to Committee on Planning and Development
1919
2020 Introduced by:
2121
2222 (PD)
2323
2424 AN ACT CONCERNING THE STATE PLAN OF CONSERVATION AND DEVELOPMENT.
2525
2626 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:
2727
2828 Section 1. Section 16a-27 of the general statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective October 1, 2011):
2929
3030 (a) The secretary, after consultation with all appropriate state, regional and local agencies and other appropriate persons, shall, prior to March 1, 2012, complete a revision of the existing plan and enlarge it to include, but not be limited to, policies relating to transportation, energy and air.
3131
3232 (b) Any revision made after May 15, 1991, shall identify the major transportation proposals, including proposals for mass transit, contained in the master transportation plan prepared pursuant to section 13b-15.
3333
3434 (c) Any revision made after July 1, 1995, shall take into consideration the conservation and development of greenways that have been designated by municipalities and shall recommend that state agencies coordinate their efforts to support the development of a state-wide greenways system. The Commissioner of Environmental Protection shall identify state-owned land for inclusion in the plan as potential components of a state greenways system.
3535
3636 [(b)] (d) Any revision made after August 20, 2003, shall take into account (1) economic and community development needs and patterns of commerce, and (2) linkages of affordable housing objectives and land use objectives with transportation systems.
3737
3838 [(c)] (e) Any revision made after March 1, 2006, shall (1) take into consideration risks associated with natural hazards, including, but not limited to, flooding, high winds and wildfires; (2) identify the potential impacts of natural hazards on infrastructure and property; and (3) make recommendations for the siting of future infrastructure and property development to minimize the use of areas prone to natural hazards, including, but not limited to, flooding, high winds and wildfires.
3939
4040 [(d)] (f) Any revision made after July 1, 2005, shall describe the progress towards achievement of the goals and objectives established in the previously adopted state plan of conservation and development and shall identify (1) areas where it is prudent and feasible (A) to have compact, transit accessible, pedestrian-oriented mixed-use development patterns and land reuse, and (B) to promote such development patterns and land reuse, (2) priority funding areas designated under section 16a-35c, and (3) corridor management areas on either side of a limited access highway or a rail line. In designating corridor management areas, the secretary shall make recommendations that (A) promote land use and transportation options to reduce the growth of traffic congestion; (B) connect infrastructure and other development decisions; (C) promote development that minimizes the cost of new infrastructure facilities and maximizes the use of existing infrastructure facilities; and (D) increase intermunicipal and regional cooperation.
4141
4242 [(e)] (g) Any revision made after October 1, 2008, shall (1) for each policy recommended (A) assign a priority; (B) estimate funding for implementation and identify potential funding sources; (C) identify each entity responsible for implementation; and (D) establish a schedule for implementation; and (2) for each growth management principle, determine three benchmarks to measure progress in implementation of the principles, one of which shall be a financial benchmark.
4343
4444 [(f)] (h) Any revision made after October 1, 2009, shall take into consideration the protection and preservation of Connecticut Heritage Areas.
4545
4646 [(g)] (i) Thereafter on or before March first in each revision year the secretary shall complete a revision of the plan of conservation and development.
4747
4848 Sec. 2. Section 16a-28 of the general statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective October 1, 2011):
4949
5050 (a) The secretary shall present a draft of the revised plan of conservation and development for preliminary review to the continuing legislative committee on state planning and development prior to September first in 2011 and prior to September first in each prerevision year thereafter.
5151
5252 (b) After December first in 2011 and after December first in each prerevision year thereafter the secretary shall proceed with such further revisions of the draft of the revised plan of conservation and development as [he] the secretary deems appropriate. The secretary shall, by whatever means [he] the secretary deems advisable, publish said plan and disseminate it to the public on or before March first in revision years. The secretary shall post the plan on the Internet web site of the state.
5353
5454 (c) Not later than five months after publication of said revised plan the secretary shall hold public hearings, in cooperation with regional planning agencies, to solicit comments on said plan.
5555
5656
5757
5858
5959 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
6060 Section 1 October 1, 2011 16a-27
6161 Sec. 2 October 1, 2011 16a-28
6262
6363 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
6464
6565 Section 1
6666
6767 October 1, 2011
6868
6969 16a-27
7070
7171 Sec. 2
7272
7373 October 1, 2011
7474
7575 16a-28
7676
77+Statement of Purpose:
7778
79+To revise the statutes concerning the state plan of conservation and development.
7880
79-PD Joint Favorable
80-
81-PD
82-
83-Joint Favorable
81+[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not underlined.]